VA HB1252 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-17 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-17 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Neighborhood assistance tax credits; low-income persons. Reduces from 300 percent to 180 percent of the poverty guidelines the maximum family annual household income for a person to be deemed a low-income person for whom services provided by a neighborhood organization may be funded under the neighborhood assistance tax credit program. Under the program, businesses and individuals are issued tax credits for donations to federal tax-exempt §501(c)(3) and §501(c)(4) nonprofit organizations undertaking programs for which at least 50 percent of the persons served under the program are low-income.
Title
Neighborhood assistance tax credit program; low-income persons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Finance (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-17 | House | Left in Finance |
2016-02-15 | House | Rereferred to Finance |
2016-02-15 | House | Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to |
2016-02-12 | House | Passed by for the day |
2016-02-11 | House | Passed by for the day |
2016-02-10 | House | Passed by for the day |
2016-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-08 | House | Reported from Finance (19-Y 3-N) |
2016-02-02 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2016-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2016-01-19 | House | Presented and ordered printed 16103798D |