VA HB1249 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0745)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0745)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Security for costs; suit or action by nonresident. Provides that in any plaintiff's suit or action by a nonresident of the Commonwealth, including a counterclaim plaintiff, cross-claim plaintiff, or third-party plaintiff, the court may order upon a motion made by a party to such suit or action and for good cause shown that such plaintiff must post security, in an amount not exceeding $250, within 60 days of entry of such order. As introduced, this bill was a recommendation of the Boyd-Graves Conference. Security for costs; suit or action by nonresident. Provides that in any plaintiff's suit or action by a nonresident of the Commonwealth, including a counterclaim plaintiff, cross-claim plaintiff, or third-party plaintiff, the court may order upon a motion made by a party to such suit or action and for good cause shown that such plaintiff must post security, in an amount not exceeding $250, within 60 days of entry of such order. As introduced, this bill was a recommendation of the Boyd-Graves Conference.
Title
Nonresident plaintiff; security costs upon suit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0745) | |
2024-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 745 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-29 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-29 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1249ER) |
2024-02-29 | House | Enrolled |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-13 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1249H1 |
2024-02-12 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24106004D-H1 |
2024-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-07 | House | Committee substitute printed 24106004D-H1 |
2024-02-07 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-01 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil |
2024-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24102433D |