VA HB1247 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibition of killing contests. Prohibits contests and competitions that offer cash or prizes for the capture or killing of coyotes or fur-bearing animals.
Title
Coyotes or fur-bearing animals; prohibition of killing contests and competitions.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Keam [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 3-N) (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2022-02-02 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 3-N) |
2022-01-31 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources |
2022-01-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2022-01-20 | House | Presented and ordered printed 22104663D |