VA HB1247 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Real property tax classifications; improvements. Adds Culpeper County to those localities permitted to have a different real property tax rate on improvements, than on all other real property. The bill also makes technical corrections.
Title
Real property tax classifications; Culpeper County permitted different tax rate on improvements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 4-N) (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-16 | House: Left in Finance | |
2010-02-03 | House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 4-N) | |
2010-01-25 | House: Assigned Finance sub: #1 | |
2010-01-18 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2010-01-18 | House: Presented and ordered printed 10103570D |