VA HB1241 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Income tax modifications for certain companies in economically distressed localities. Adds the City of Portsmouth to the list of economically distressed localities in which a company may invest to become eligible for certain income tax modifications. Under current law, a company is eligible for such modifications if, among other things, it either (i) invests at least $5 million in new capital investment in a qualified locality and creates at least 10 jobs paying at least 150 percent of the minimum wage in a qualified locality or (ii) creates at least 50 jobs paying at least 150 percent of the minimum wage in a qualified locality.
Title
Income tax, state; modifications for certain companies in economically distressed localities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 5-N) (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Finance |
2020-01-20 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 5-N) |
2020-01-16 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2020-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103381D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 958.2:01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 405.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |