VA HB1241 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-01 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-01 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Standards for guardians ad litem appointed in custody and visitation cases; certification form; substitute judges in custody and visitation proceedings. The bill requires a guardian ad litem appointed in a custody or visitation case to submit to the court a form certifying that he has complied with all applicable standards. The bill directs the Judicial Council of Virginia, in conjunction with the Virginia State Bar and the Virginia Bar Association, to promulgate such a form by July 1, 2017. The bill prohibits a substitute judge from presiding over any custody, visitation, or support proceeding held in a juvenile and domestic relations district court.
Title
Guardian ad litem; standards for those appointed in custody & visitation cases, certification form.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-01 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2016-02-03 | House | Continued to 2017 in Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2016-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2017 by voice vote |
2016-01-21 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2016-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-01-19 | House | Presented and ordered printed 16104020D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 241 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 266.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 69.21 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB1241 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1241+hil |