VA HB1236 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-29 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-29 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Special license plates; U.S. Army Rangers. Authorizes the issuance of special license plates to members and former members of the U.S. Army Rangers.
Title
License plates, special; issuance to members and former members of U.S. Army Rangers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-29 | House | Left in Transportation |
2012-02-09 | House | Continued to 2013 in Transportation by voice vote |
2012-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2013 by voice vote |
2012-01-27 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: #3 |
2012-01-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2012-01-20 | House | Presented and ordered printed 12103831D |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+sum+HB1236 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB1236+hil |