VA HB123 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0395)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0395)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Town of Buchanan charter; elections; town council members; employees of town. Staggers the elections of the town's four council members so that, beginning with the November general election in 2019, two members shall be elected to two-year terms in odd-numbered years, and two members and the mayor shall be elected to two-year terms in even-numbered years. The bill also makes the town clerk and town treasurer employees of the town, responsible to the town manager. The bill changes who shall appoint the town treasurer from the town council to the town manager. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Buchanan, Town of; amending charter, election of council member.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendment (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendment (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0395) | |
2018-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 395 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-07 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-07 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 7, 2018 |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-01 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-01 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB123ER) |
2018-03-01 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-27 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-27 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-27 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Reported from Local Government with amendment (12-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-08 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-08 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-07 | House | Printed as engrossed 18101231D-E |
2018-02-07 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB123E |
2018-02-07 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2018-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-02 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-16 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2017-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2017-12-18 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101231D |