VA HB1227 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0050)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0050)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Landlord and tenant law; transient lodging as primary residence for fewer than 90 consecutive days; self-help eviction. Clarifies that the availability of the use of self-help eviction in certain circumstances to the owner of transient lodging shall not preclude such owner from pursuing any civil or criminal remedies under the laws of the Commonwealth. This bill is identical to SB 286.
Title
Landlord and tenant law; transient lodging as primary residence.
Sponsors
Del. C.E. Hayes [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0050) | |
2018-02-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 50 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-02-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 1, 2018 | |
2018-02-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/22/18 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-19 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1227ER) |
2018-02-19 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-05 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-02 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1227H1 |
2018-02-02 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 18105617D-H1 |
2018-02-02 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-30 | House | Committee substitute printed 18105617D-H1 |
2018-01-30 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2018-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101140D |