VA HB1225 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Memorials for war veterans. Provides that a locality may remove or provide for the upkeep, maintenance, or contextualization of any monument or memorial for war veterans located in its public space, regardless of when erected. Current law makes it unlawful to disturb or interfere with such monuments or memorials or to prevent its citizens from taking proper measures and exercising proper means for the protection, preservation, and care of such monuments or memorials.
Title
War veterans; removal or upkeep of monument or memorial.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Counties, Cities and Towns |
2018-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (6-Y 2-N) |
2018-01-22 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2018-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104601D |