VA HB1218 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0009)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0009)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Waterfowl blinds; licenses. Shifts the times to obtain waterfowl blind licenses to earlier in the year and distinguishes between nonriparian licenses for stationary blinds that have or have not been licensed the previous year. The provisions of the bill will become effective on January 1, 2011.
Title
Waterfowl blinds; shifts times to obtain licenses to earlier in year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0009) | |
2010-02-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 9 (effective 1/1/11) | |
2010-02-18 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-02-17 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-02-17 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1218ER) | |
2010-02-17 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-02-10 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-10 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-02-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-08 | Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 1-N) | |
2010-02-02 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources | |
2010-02-02 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-01 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-01 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-29 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2010-01-28 | House: Read first time | |
2010-01-27 | House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-14 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2010-01-14 | House: Presented and ordered printed 10103678D |