VA HB1214 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Damage to motor vehicles; catalytic converter; penalties. Makes it a Class 6 felony for a person to commit larceny of a catalytic converter from a motor vehicle, regardless of the converter's value, and provides that any person found in possession of a catalytic converter that has been detached from a motor vehicle shall be presumed to have committed larceny of the catalytic converter unless such person (i) is an authorized scrap seller or (ii) has in his possession documentation establishing that such person lawfully possesses the catalytic converter. The bill also makes it a Class 6 felony for a person to willfully break, injure, tamper with, or remove any part or parts of any vehicle, aircraft, boat, or vessel for the purpose of injuring, defacing, or destroying said vehicle, aircraft, boat, or vessel, or temporarily or permanently preventing its useful operation, or for any purpose against the will or without the consent of the owner, or to in any other manner willfully or maliciously interfere with or prevent the running or operation of such vehicle, aircraft, boat, or vessel, when such violation causes damage to such vehicle, aircraft, boat, or vessel of $1,000 or more. Current law makes such violation a Class 1 misdemeanor with no limit on the amount of damage. Under the bill, the penalty for damage of less than $1,000 remains a Class 1 misdemeanor. For the purposes of determining whether there is damage of $1,000 or more, the bill provides that the cost of any replacement part or parts of any vehicle, aircraft, boat, or vessel and any additional cost necessary to install such replacement part or parts shall be included in the cost of the damage. Damage to motor vehicles; catalytic converter; penalties. Makes it a Class 6 felony for a person to commit larceny of a catalytic converter from a motor vehicle, regardless of the converter's value, and provides that any person found in possession of a catalytic converter that has been detached from a motor vehicle shall be presumed to have committed larceny of the catalytic converter unless such person (i) is an authorized scrap seller or (ii) has in his possession documentation establishing that such person lawfully possesses the catalytic converter. The bill also makes it a Class 6 felony for a person to willfully break, injure, tamper with, or remove any part or parts of any vehicle, aircraft, boat, or vessel for the purpose of injuring, defacing, or destroying said vehicle, aircraft, boat, or vessel, or temporarily or permanently preventing its useful operation, or for any purpose against the will or without the consent of the owner, or to in any other manner willfully or maliciously interfere with or prevent the running or operation of such vehicle, aircraft, boat, or vessel, when such violation causes damage to such vehicle, aircraft, boat, or vessel of $1,000 or more. Current law makes such violation a Class 1 misdemeanor with no limit on the amount of damage. Under the bill, the penalty for damage of less than $1,000 remains a Class 1 misdemeanor. For the purposes of determining whether there is damage of $1,000 or more, the bill provides that the cost of any replacement part or parts of any vehicle, aircraft, boat, or vessel and any additional cost necessary to install such replacement part or parts shall be included in the cost of the damage. The bill also requires a scrap metal purchaser, when purchasing proprietary articles from a person who is not an authorized scrap seller, to (a) make copies of the documentation received from the seller establishing the seller lawfully possesses the proprietary articles and keep such copies with the permanent ledger maintained at the scrap metal purchaser's place of business and (b) after purchasing a proprietary article from a person, submit a report to the local sheriff's department or the chief of police describing the proprietary article and including a copy of the seller's identifying information and documentation that the seller lawfully possessed such article.
Title
Catalytic converter; damage to motor vehicles, penalties.
Sponsors
Del. Betsy Carr [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2022-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-27 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-01-18 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2022-01-18 | House | Presented and ordered printed 22103867D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 146 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 97.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 136.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |