VA HB1203 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0393)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0393)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Real property tax exemption; disabled veterans and the spouse of a service member killed in action. Provides that the real property tax exemption for the residence of a disabled veteran, or the residence of the spouse of a service member killed in action, (i) includes manufactured homes whether or not the wheels and other equipment previously used for mobility have been removed and (ii) applies to residences whether or not the veteran or the spouse owns the land on which the residence is located.
Title
Real property tax; exemption for disabled veterans and spouse of a service member killed in action.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-29 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0393) | |
2016-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0393) | |
2016-03-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 393 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/11/16 |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-01 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-01 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1203ER) |
2016-03-01 | House | Enrolled |
2016-02-29 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-29 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-11 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1203H1 |
2016-02-10 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 16105130D-H1 |
2016-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-08 | House | Committee substitute printed 16105130D-H1 |
2016-02-08 | House | Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-02 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2016-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2016-01-16 | House | Presented and ordered printed 16104173D |
Same As/Similar To
SB366 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0349)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 653.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3219.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3219.9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |