VA HB1202 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-18 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-18 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
State Inspector General; lean government initiative. Requires the State Inspector General to implement the lean government initiative. The bill defines "lean government initiative" as a business-oriented system for organizing and managing product development, operations, suppliers, and customer relations to create precise customer value, expressed as providing goods and services with higher quality and fewer defects and errors, with less human effort, less space, less capital, and less time than more traditional systems and sets out the responsibilities of the State Inspector General in its implementation among state agencies.
Title
State Inspector General; lean government initiative.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-18 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2016-02-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-02-12 | House | Assigned App. sub: General Government & Capital Outlay |
2016-02-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-02-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting by voice vote |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred from General Laws by voice vote |
2016-01-20 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2016-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2016-01-16 | House | Presented and ordered printed 16104200D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB1202 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB1202+hil |