VA HB1202 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0048)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0048)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local property and license taxes on mineral lands. Permits a commissioner of the revenue to enter into agreements with taxpayers regarding the fair market value of mineral lands and deems any such agreements entered into on or after January 1, 2013, but prior to July 1, 2014, valid and enforceable. The bill states that it is declaratory of existing law.
Title
Mineral lands; local property and license taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Finance (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Finance (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0048) | |
2014-02-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 48 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-17 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-17 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1202ER) |
2014-02-17 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-06 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-05 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-03 | House | Reported from Finance (20-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-28 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2014-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2014-01-17 | House | Presented and ordered printed 14103785D |
Same As/Similar To
SB338 (Same As) 2014-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0179)