VA HB1198 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0190)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0190)
Summary
Commercial driver's licenses. Brings Virginia law on commercial driver's licenses into conformance with federal requirements.
Title
Driver's license, commercial; State law conformance with federal requirements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0190) | |
2008-03-03 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 190 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-02-21 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-02-20 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1198ER) | |
2008-02-20 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-02-19 | Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-19 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-18 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-14 | Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-30 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2008-01-30 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-01-29 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-01-29 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-29 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-28 | House: Printed as engrossed 081157828-E | |
2008-01-28 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB1198E | |
2008-01-28 | House: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2008-01-28 | House: Read second time | |
2008-01-25 | House: Read first time | |
2008-01-24 | House: Reported from Transportation with amendments (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-09 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2008-01-09 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 081157828 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB1198 |