VA HB1197 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-28 - VOTE: (48-Y 52-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-28 - VOTE: (48-Y 52-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Secretariat agency responsibilities; Department of Juvenile Justice. Directs the Office of the Secretary of Public Safety and Homeland Security and the Office of the Secretary of Health and Human Resources to convene a stakeholder work group to determine the feasibility and benefits of transferring responsibility for the Department of Juvenile Justice from the Secretary of Public Safety and Homeland Security to the Secretary of Health and Human Resources. The bill requires the work group to submit its report containing the work group's finding by November 1, 2022, to the Chairmen of the House Committee for Courts of Justice, House Committee on Public Safety, Senate Committee on the Judiciary, and Senate Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services.
Title
Secretariat agency responsibilities; Department of Juvenile Justice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-28 - House - House: VOTE: (48-Y 52-N) (Y: 48 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (32-Y 7-N) (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (64-Y 35-N) (Y: 64 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (32-Y 7-N) (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (64-Y 35-N) (Y: 64 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-28 | House | VOTE: (48-Y 52-N) |
2022-04-27 | House | House sustained Governor's veto (48-Y 52-N) |
2022-04-27 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-10 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-10 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1197ER) |
2022-03-10 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate (32-Y 7-N) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 1-N) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-15 | House | VOTE: Passage (64-Y 35-N) |
2022-02-15 | House | Read third time and passed House (64-Y 35-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-11 | House | Reported from Public Safety (15-Y 6-N) |
2022-02-10 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) |
2022-02-08 | House | Assigned PS sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2022-01-17 | House | Presented and ordered printed 22104383D |
Subjects
Administration of Government
Health and Human Resources Secretary of
Juvenile Justice
Public Safety and Homeland Security Secretary of
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Uncodified Legislation
Health and Human Resources Secretary of
Juvenile Justice
Public Safety and Homeland Security Secretary of
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Uncodified Legislation