VA HB1195 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-29 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-29 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Tandem axle weight limit. Increases the maximum tandem axle weight limit from 34,000 pounds to 40,000 pounds.
Title
Vehicle weight limits; increases tandem axle weight limit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-29 | House | Left in Transportation |
2012-02-07 | House | Continued to 2013 with substitute in Transportation by voice vote |
2012-02-07 | House | Committee substitute printed 12104419D-H1 |
2012-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2013 by voice vote |
2012-01-27 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: #2 |
2012-01-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2012-01-18 | House | Presented and ordered printed 12104168D |