VA HB1187 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0463)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0463)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Out-of-state health care practitioners; temporary authorization to practice; licensure by reciprocity for physicians; emergency. Allows a health care practitioner licensed in another state or the District of Columbia who has submitted an application for licensure to the appropriate health regulatory board to temporarily practice for a period of 90 days pending licensure, provided that certain conditions are met. The bill directs the Board of Medicine to pursue reciprocity agreements with jurisdictions that surround the Commonwealth to streamline the application process in order to facilitate the practice of medicine. The bill requires the Department of Health Professions to annually report to the Chairmen of the Senate Committee on Education and Health and the House Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions the number of out-of-state health care practitioners who have utilized the temporary authorization to practice pending licensure and have not subsequently been issued full licensure.
Title
Out-of-state health care practitioners; temporary authorization to practice.
Sponsors
Del. Dan Helmer [D] | Del. Phillip Scott [R] | Del. Timothy Anderson [R] | Del. Elizabeth Bennett-Parker [D] |
Del. Carrie Coyner [R] | Del. Glenn Davis [R] | Del. Kathleen Murphy [D] | Sen. Suhas Subramanyam [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0463) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 463 (effective 4/11/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-08 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1187ER) |
2022-03-08 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-03 | House | VOTE: Adoption (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-03 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 22106947D-S1 (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1187S1 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22106947D-S1 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22106947D-S1 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-15 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-15 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1187H1 |
2022-02-14 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22105376D-H1 |
2022-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-10 | House | Committee substitute printed 22105376D-H1 |
2022-02-10 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2022-01-17 | House | Presented and ordered printed with emergency clause 22104638D |
Same As/Similar To
SB317 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0464)
SB317 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0464)
SB317 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0464)
Subjects
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
Emergency Legislation
Health
Physicians and Surgeons
Professions and Occupations
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Emergency Legislation
Health
Physicians and Surgeons
Professions and Occupations
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 2408.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2941.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |