VA SB317 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0464)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0464)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Out-of-state health care practitioners; temporary authorization to practice; licensure by reciprocity for physicians; emergency. Allows a health care practitioner licensed in another state or the District of Columbia who has submitted an application for licensure to the appropriate health regulatory board to temporarily practice for a period of 90 days pending licensure, provided that certain conditions are met. The bill directs the Board of Medicine to pursue reciprocity agreements with jurisdictions that surround the Commonwealth to streamline the application process in order to facilitate the practice of medicine. The bill requires the Department of Health Professions to annually report to the Chairmen of the Senate Committee on Education and Health and the House Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions the number of out-of-state health care practitioners who have utilized the temporary authorization to practice pending licensure and have not subsequently been issued full licensure.
Title
Out-of-state health care practitioners; temporary authorization to practice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0464) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 464 (effective 4/11/22) | |
2022-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022 |
2022-03-04 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB317ER) |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Title replaced 22106790D-H1 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-25 | House | VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-25 | House | Passed House with substitute (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-25 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB317H1 |
2022-02-25 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22106790D-H1 |
2022-02-25 | House | Read third time |
2022-02-24 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-22 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (20-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-22 | House | Committee substitute printed 22106790D-H1 |
2022-02-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2022-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 22103982D-E |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB317E |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/12/22 22103982D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1187 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0463)
HB1187 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0463)
HB1187 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0463)
Subjects
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
Emergency Legislation
Health
Physicians and Surgeons
Professions and Occupations
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Emergency Legislation
Health
Physicians and Surgeons
Professions and Occupations
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 2408.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2941.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |