VA HB1187 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - House: Left in Commerce and Labor (0-Y 0-N)
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - House: Left in Commerce and Labor (0-Y 0-N)
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Noncompetition agreements. Makes unlawful any contract that serves to restrict an employee or former employee from engaging in a lawful profession, trade, or business of any kind. Exceptions are created for persons selling a business, former partners in a partnership, and former members in a limited liability company, who agree to refrain from carrying on a similar business within a specified geographic area in which the original entity carries on business.
Title
Noncompetition agreements; prohibits contract that serves to restrict an employee from engaging.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-14 - House - House: Left in Commerce and Labor (0-Y 0-N) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 23 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | House: Left in Commerce and Labor (0-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-07 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2012-01-31 | House: Assigned C & L sub: #1 | |
2012-01-18 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2012-01-18 | House: Presented and ordered printed 12104107D |