VA HB1186 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 18 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Disposal of solid waste fees; Russell County. Allows Russell County to levy fees by ordinance, and after a public hearing, for the disposal and management of solid waste at a county collection or disposal facility not to exceed the actual cost incurred by the county in procuring, developing, maintaining, and improving the landfill and for such reserves as may be necessary for capping and closing such landfill in the future. The bill adds Russell County to the list of counties permitted to use fees to purchase equipment and grants Russell County the same authority that Accomack, Highland, Pittsylvania, Southampton, and Wise Counties have regarding collection of such fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Disposal of solid waste fees; Russell County.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (96-Y 1-N) (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N) (Y: 0 N: 95 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendments (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (88-Y 10-N) (Y: 88 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-20HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020
2020-03-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-18SenateSigned by President
2020-03-18HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1186ER)
2020-03-18HouseEnrolled
2020-03-07SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-03-05HouseVOTE: Adoption (96-Y 1-N)
2020-03-05HouseConference report agreed to by House (96-Y 1-N)
2020-03-05 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2020-03-02SenateSenators: Chafin, Pillion, Bell
2020-03-02SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2020-02-27HouseDelegates: Wampler, Roem, Subramanyam
2020-02-27HouseConferees appointed by House
2020-02-27HouseHouse acceded to request
2020-02-26SenateSenate requested conference committee
2020-02-26SenateSenate insisted on amendments (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-25SenatePassed by for the day
2020-02-21HouseVOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N)
2020-02-21HouseSenate amendments rejected by House (0-Y 96-N)
2020-02-21HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-19SenatePassed Senate with amendments (38-Y 1-N)
2020-02-19SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2020-02-19SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2020-02-19SenateReading of amendments waived
2020-02-19SenateRead third time
2020-02-18SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2020-02-17SenateReported from Local Government with amendments (14-Y 1-N)
2020-02-07SenateReferred to Committee on Local Government
2020-02-07SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-06HouseVOTE: Passage (88-Y 10-N)
2020-02-06HouseRead third time and passed House (88-Y 10-N)
2020-02-05HouseRead second time and engrossed
2020-02-04HouseRead first time
2020-01-31HouseReported from Counties, Cities and Towns (20-Y 1-N)
2020-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
2020-01-21HouseAssigned CC & T sub: Charters
2020-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
2020-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102276D

Same As/Similar To

SB329 (Same As) 2020-03-20 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1522159(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB1186&201+sum+HB1186
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1186+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1186ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0701V0020+HB1186
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H07V0025+HB1186
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0469+HB1186
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S07V0101+HB1186
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0702HB1186+HB1186
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0726HB1186+HB1186
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1136+HB1186
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0991HB1186+HB1186
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1913+HB1186
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1724HB1186+HB1186

Bill Comments

feedback