VA SB329 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 18 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Disposal of solid waste fees; Russell County. Allows Russell County to levy fees by ordinance, and after a public hearing, for the disposal and management of solid waste at a county collection or disposal facility not to exceed the actual cost incurred by the county in procuring, developing, maintaining, and improving the landfill and for such reserves as may be necessary for capping and closing such landfill in the future. The bill adds Russell County to the list of counties permitted to use fees to purchase equipment and grants Russell County the same authority that Accomack, Highland, Pittsylvania, Southampton, and Wise Counties have regarding collection of such fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Disposal of solid waste fees; Russell County.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (89-Y 8-N) (Y: 89 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: House amendments rejected by Senate (1-Y 37-N) (Y: 1 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendments (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-20SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020
2020-03-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-18SenateSigned by President
2020-03-18SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB329ER)
2020-03-18SenateEnrolled
2020-03-07SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N)
2020-03-05HouseVOTE: Adoption (89-Y 8-N)
2020-03-05HouseConference report agreed to by House (89-Y 8-N)
2020-03-05 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2020-03-04HouseDelegates: Wampler, Roem, Subramanyam
2020-03-04HouseConferees appointed by House
2020-03-03SenateSenators: Chafin, Pillion, Bell
2020-03-03SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2020-03-03SenateSenate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
2020-03-02HouseHouse requested conference committee
2020-03-02HouseHouse insisted on amendments
2020-02-28SenateHouse amendments rejected by Senate (1-Y 37-N)
2020-02-26HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
2020-02-26HousePassed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2020-02-26HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2020-02-26HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2020-02-26HousePassed by temporarily
2020-02-26HouseRead third time
2020-02-25HouseRead second time
2020-02-21HouseReported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
2020-02-20HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N)
2020-02-13HouseAssigned CC & T sub: Land Use
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
2020-02-13HouseRead first time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-01-23SenateRead third time and passed Senate (37-Y 3-N)
2020-01-22SenatePrinted as engrossed 20102957D-E
2020-01-22SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB329E
2020-01-22SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2020-01-22SenateReading of amendments waived
2020-01-22SenateRead second time
2020-01-21SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-01-20SenateReported from Local Government with amendments (14-Y 1-N)
2020-01-06SenateReferred to Committee on Local Government
2020-01-06SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102957D

Same As/Similar To

HB1186 (Same As) 2020-03-20 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1522159(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB329&201+sum+SB329
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB329+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB329E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB329ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S07V0021+SB0329
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0109SB0329+SB0329
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0128SB0329+SB0329
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0702V0129+SB0329
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H07V0105+SB0329
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1549+SB0329
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1230SB0329+SB0329
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1428SB0329+SB0329
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1902+SB0329
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1768SB0329+SB0329

Bill Comments

feedback