VA HB1186 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0796)
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0796)
Summary
Incompetent defendants; misdemeanors; dismissal of charges. Provides that if a defendant has been charged with a misdemeanor under Article 3 (§ 18.2-95 et seq.) of Chapter 5 of Title 18.2 (larceny and receiving stolen goods), Article 5 (§ 18.2-119 et seq.) of Chapter 5 of Title 18.2 (trespass to realty) except an offense under § 18.2-130 (peeping or spying into dwelling or enclosure), or Article 2 (§ 18.2-415 et seq.) of Chapter 9 of Title 18.2 (disorderly conduct), and is being treated in an effort to restore his capacity, then after 45 days, if his capacity has not been restored, the court shall decide whether he should be released, committed, or certified and the court may dismiss the charges. This bill incorporates
Title
Incompetent defendants; dismissal of charges when charged with nonviolent misdemeanor.
Sponsors
Del. Robert Brink [D] | Del. Phillip Hamilton [R] | Del. Kenneth Melvin [D] | Del. Harvey Morgan [R] |
Del. John O'Bannon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0796) | |
2008-04-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 796 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-09 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-07 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-07 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1186ER) | |
2008-03-07 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-03-05 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (80-Y 18-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Senate amendment agreed to by House (80-Y 18-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-14 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Special on Proposed Mental Health Legislation | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-12 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-12 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (87-Y 12-N) | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read third time and passed House (87-Y 12-N) | |
2008-02-11 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1186H1 | |
2008-02-11 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 080878636-H1 | |
2008-02-11 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-09 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-09 | House: Committee substitute printed 080878636-H1 | |
2008-02-08 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 5-N) | |
2008-01-16 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2008-01-09 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-09 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 087939840 |
Same As/Similar To
HB1378 (Similar To) 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0870)
SB380 (Same As) 2010-02-02 - Senate: Stricken at request of Patron in Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
SB380 (Same As) 2010-02-02 - Senate: Stricken at request of Patron in Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB1186 |