VA HB1183 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Operating motor vehicle with accumulated snow or ice; penalty. Provides that it is a traffic infraction punishable by a fine of $100 for a person to operate a moving motor vehicle with any amount of accumulated snow or ice on its exposed surfaces where, were the snow or ice to become dislodged from such vehicle, such accumulated snow or ice could interfere with the operation of another motor vehicle or cause injury to persons or property. The bill exempts from the infraction a person operating an emergency vehicle, a vehicle engaged in snow or ice removal and control operations, or a vehicle operated during adverse weather conditions arising after operation of the vehicle began that result in the accumulation of snow or ice on such vehicle.
Title
Motor vehicles; operating with accumulated snow or ice, penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Transportation |
2022-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 1-N) |
2022-01-24 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #3 Highway Safety and Policy |
2022-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2022-01-17 | House | Presented and ordered printed 22104461D |