VA HB1183 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0863)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0863)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State Corporation Commission; bulk energy storage resources. Requires the State Corporation Commission to establish a task force to evaluate and analyze the potential for bulk energy storage resources to, among other things, help integrate renewable energy into the electrical grid. The measure requires the Commission to submit the results of task force's evaluation and analysis to the General Assembly by October 1, 2021.
Title
Bulk energy storage resources; State Corporation Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (91-Y 9-N) (Y: 91 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (91-Y 9-N) (Y: 91 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0863) | |
2020-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 863 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-17 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 17, 2020 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-12 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-12 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1183ER) |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-07 | House | VOTE: Passage (91-Y 9-N) |
2020-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House (91-Y 9-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1183H1 |
2020-02-06 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20107411D-H1 |
2020-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-04 | House | Committee substitute printed 20107411D-H1 |
2020-02-04 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (21-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-16 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2020-01-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2020-01-15 | House | Referred from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104921D |