VA HB1179 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0703)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0703)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public schools; character education. Provides that a school board, either within its existing programs or as a separate program, may provide its character education program during the summer in a youth development academy offered by the school division. The Department of Education shall develop curricular guidelines for school divisions to use in establishing a character education program through a summer youth development academy.
Title
Public schools; providing character education program during regular school year or summer.
Sponsors
Del. Joseph Yost [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 3-N) (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 3-N) (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0703) | |
2012-04-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 703 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-03-05 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-02 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-02 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1179ER) | |
2012-03-02 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-14 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 3-N) | |
2012-02-14 | House: Read third time and passed House (95-Y 3-N) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Printed as engrossed 12104029D-E | |
2012-02-13 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB1179E | |
2012-02-13 | House: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-10 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-08 | House: Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 2-N) | |
2012-02-06 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-26 | House: Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education | |
2012-01-25 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-01-25 | House: Reported from Education with amendments (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-18 | House: Referred to Committee on Education | |
2012-01-18 | House: Presented and ordered printed 12104029D |