VA HB1172 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0675)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0675)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Temporary detention; transfer. Establishes a procedure for transferring custody of a person who is the subject of a temporary detention order from one facility to another facility.
Title
Temporary detention; procedure for transferring person.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0675) | |
2014-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 675 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1172ER) |
2014-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-11 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1172H1 |
2014-02-10 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 14104741D-H1 |
2014-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-06 | House | Passed by until Monday, February 10, 2014 |
2014-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-03 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-03 | House | Committee substitute printed 14104741D-H1 |
2014-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-23 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Mental Health |
2014-01-15 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-15 | House | Presented and ordered printed 14103049D |