VA HB1171 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Commonwealth Clean Energy Financing Authority and Fund; established. Establishes the Commonwealth Clean Energy Financing Authority and the Commonwealth Clean Energy Financing Authority Fund to increase private investment in clean energy and resiliency projects in the Commonwealth. The bill requires the Authority to ensure that the projects and programs financed complement the goals of the Virginia Energy Plan and programs implemented by the Department of Energy, Department of Housing and Community Development, Department of Conservation and Recreation, and other relevant public and private entities. The bill requires that at least 40 percent of the resources deployed through the Authority are directed to historically economically disadvantaged communities. The bill provides that the Authority will have a total membership of 11 members that consist of nine nonlegislative citizen members and the Director of the Department of Energy and the Director of the Department of Housing and Community Development or their designees as ex officio members. The bill includes general powers and duties of the Authority, including submission of an annual report. The bill also includes various requirements for notes and bonds issued by the Authority.
Title
Commonwealth Clean Energy Financing Authority and Fund; established, report.
Sponsors
Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2022-02-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-10 | House | Reported from Commerce and Energy (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) |
2022-01-28 | House | Assigned sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Energy |
2022-01-14 | House | Presented and ordered printed 22104127D |