VA HB1171 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-05 - Continued to 2017 in Militia, Police and Public Safety by voice vote
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-05 - Continued to 2017 in Militia, Police and Public Safety by voice vote
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Board of Corrections; notification of tertiary care of prisoner. Requires the Board of Corrections to promulgate regulations for state and local correctional facilities requiring that notification be made to a prisoner's family or stated emergency contact person whenever a prisoner is moved within or without his assigned facility for the purposes of tertiary care unless these is reasonable cause to believe that such notification is a threat to the safety of any person.
Title
Corrections, Board of; notification of tertiary care of prisoner.
Sponsors
Del. Larry Rush [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-05 | House | Continued to 2017 in Militia, Police and Public Safety by voice vote |
2016-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2017 by voice vote |
2016-01-18 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: #3 |
2016-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2016-01-14 | House | Presented and ordered printed 16103726D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB1171 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB1171+hil |