VA HB1167 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - House sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - House sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Local prohibition on the sale of English ivy; civil penalty. Authorizes any locality to adopt an ordinance prohibiting the sale of English ivy, with violations punishable by a civil penalty not to exceed $50 for a first violation and not to exceed $200 for a subsequent violation within 12 months.
Title
English ivy; local prohibition on sale, civil penalty.
Sponsors
Del. Paul Krizek [D] | Del. David Bulova [D] | Del. Nadarius Clark [D] | Del. Rae Cousins [D] |
Del. Marcus Simon [D] | Del. Richard Sullivan [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 45-N) (Y: 54 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 3-N) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 45-N) (Y: 54 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 3-N) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | House | House sustained Governor's veto |
2024-03-14 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-28 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-28 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1167ER) |
2024-02-28 | House | Enrolled |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (8-Y 7-N) |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-06 | House | VOTE: Passage (54-Y 45-N) |
2024-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House (54-Y 45-N) |
2024-02-05 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2024-01-31 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (14-Y 8-N) |
2024-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 3-N) |
2024-01-23 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Agriculture |
2024-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2024-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24104616D |