VA HB1163 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-04 - Continued to 2015 in Transportation by voice vote
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-04 - Continued to 2015 in Transportation by voice vote
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allocation of federal funds for establishment and maintenance of trails. Allows the Commonwealth Transportation Board to allocate eligible federal funds for use in the establishment and maintenance of trails.
Title
Trails; allocation of federal funds for establishment and maintenance.
Sponsors
Del. Terry Kilgore [R] | Del. James Morefield [R] | Del. Israel O'Quinn [R] | Sen. Benton Chafin [R] |
Del. Jeffrey Campbell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-04 | House | Continued to 2015 in Transportation by voice vote |
2014-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2015 by voice vote |
2014-01-24 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2014-01-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2014-01-15 | House | Presented and ordered printed 14103609D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HB1163 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB1163+hil |