VA HB1162 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Public Safety
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Public Safety
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Security camera monitoring by law-enforcement agencies. Provides that any law-enforcement agency having jurisdiction over criminal law enforcement or regulatory violations may establish a program to allow for the monitoring or reviewing of security cameras, as defined in the bill, for the purpose of tracking and reducing crime by such law-enforcement agency. The bill requires that any law-enforcement agency establishing such program shall develop a policy for how such security cameras will be monitored and how such data from such security cameras will be used and maintained.
Title
Law-enforcement agencies; security camera monitoring.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Public Safety |
2024-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N) |
2024-01-19 | House | Assigned PS sub: Public Safety |
2024-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2024-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24102058D |