VA HB1161 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Teacher grievance procedures; hearing; three-member fact-finding panel. Permits a school board to conduct a teacher grievance hearing before a three-member fact-finding panel consisting of one member selected by the teacher, one member selected by the division superintendent, and a third impartial member selected by the other two panel members. Under current law, the school board has the option of appointing a hearing officer or conducting such hearing itself.
Title
Teacher grievance procedures; hearing, three-member fact-finding panel.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Education |
2018-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2018-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102911D |