VA HB116 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic light photo-monitoring systems. Amends provisions related to photo-monitoring systems by providing that certain safety analyses, currently required prior to implementation, shall also be required prior to renewal of such a system. Other changes relate to photo-monitoring of lanes in which turning movements are permitted, specifying when such systems may be used, and the yellow time requirements for such lanes.
Title
Traffic light signal photo-monitoring; amends provisions related to implementation of systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Left in Transportation |
2014-01-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2013-12-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2013-12-17 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101776D |