VA HB1151 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0507)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0507)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Nonresident youth fishing license; exemption. Authorizes a nonresident under age 16 to fish without a fishing license when accompanied by a person possessing a valid license to fish in Virginia and allows such nonresident to fish for trout without a license in designated waters. Current law allows a nonresident under age 12 to fish without a license but requires a license for such nonresident when fishing for trout in designated waters.
Title
Nonresident youth fishing license; exemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 3-N) (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 3-N) (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0507) | |
2018-03-29 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 507 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-07 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-07 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 7, 2018 |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-01 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-01 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1151ER) |
2018-03-01 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Rereferred from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-13 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 3-N) |
2018-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House (96-Y 3-N) |
2018-02-12 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-09 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-01 | House | Assigned App. sub: Commerce, Agriculture, Natural Resources & Technology |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-01-31 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (20-Y 2-N) |
2018-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) |
2018-01-23 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2018-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101521D |