VA HB1145 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0574)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Veterinarians; reporting suspected animal cruelty. Provides that any veterinarian who makes a report of suspected animal cruelty or who provides records or information related to a report of suspected cruelty or testifies in any judicial proceeding arising from such report, records, or information shall be immune from any civil or criminal liability or administrative penalty or sanction on account of such report, records, information, or testimony, unless such veterinarian acted in bad faith or with malicious purpose.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Animal cruelty; requires veterinarian to report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (94-Y 4-N) (Y: 96 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-11 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0574)
2010-04-11 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 574 (effective 7/1/10)
2010-03-13 Senate: Signed by President
2010-03-12 House: Signed by Speaker
2010-03-12 House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1145ER)
2010-03-12 House: Enrolled
2010-03-05 House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (94-Y 4-N)
2010-03-05 House: Senate amendments agreed to by House (94-Y 4-N)
2010-03-04 House: Placed on Calendar
2010-03-03 Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
2010-03-03 Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended
2010-03-03 Senate: Committee amendments agreed to
2010-03-03 Senate: Reading of amendments waived
2010-03-03 Senate: Read third time
2010-03-02 Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2010-03-01 Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
2010-02-11 Senate: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2010-02-11 Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed
2010-02-10 House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2010-02-10 House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2010-02-09 House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1145H1
2010-02-09 House: Committee substitute agreed to 10105032D-H1
2010-02-09 House: Read second time
2010-02-08 House: Read first time
2010-02-04 House: Committee substitute printed 10105032D-H1
2010-02-04 House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2010-02-02 House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 0-N)
2010-02-01 House: Assigned HWI sub: #3
2010-01-27 House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2010-01-27 House: Referred from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
2010-01-13 House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2010-01-13 House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101308D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5413812.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+sum+HB1145
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+HB1145+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+HB1145H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+HB1145ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+CHAP0574+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+vot+H1203V0014+HB1145
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+vot+H12V0055+HB1145
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+vot+HV0469+HB1145
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+vot+S01V0166+HB1145
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+vot+SV0555HB1145+HB1145
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+vot+SV0570HB1145+HB1145
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+vot+HV1313+HB1145

Bill Comments

feedback