VA HB1144 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Conference Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Voter registration; persons assisting with the completion or collection of completed voter registration applications; certain identifying information required. Requires any person who assists an applicant with the completion of a voter registration application or collects a completed voter registration application directly from an applicant to provide his name and telephone number and indicate the group or organization he is affiliated with, if any, on the registration application. The provisions of the bill do not apply to any state or local government employee who assists with the completion of registration applications or collects completed registration applications as part of his official duties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voter registration; persons assisting with the return of signed voter registration applications.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (52-Y 47-N) (Y: 52 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (48-Y 48-N) (Y: 48 N: 48 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (11-Y 3-N) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: (54-Y 43-N) (Y: 54 N: 43 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18 Governor: Vetoed by Governor
2018-04-18 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, May 18, 2018
2018-04-18HouseCommunicated to Governor
2018-04-18HouseSpeaker ruled Governor's recommendation with a substitute not germane
2018-04-09HouseGovernor's substitute printed 18108397D-H1
2018-04-09HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2018-03-15 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-15HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 15, 2018
2018-03-09SenateSigned by President
2018-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-07HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1144ER)
2018-03-07HouseEnrolled
2018-03-05HouseVOTE: ADOPTION #2 (52-Y 47-N)
2018-03-05HouseSenate amendments agreed to by House (52-Y 47-N)
2018-03-05HouseReconsideration of Senate amendments agreed to by House
2018-03-05HouseVOTE: REJECTED (48-Y 48-N)
2018-03-05HouseSenate amendments rejected by House (48-Y 48-N)
2018-03-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-03-01SenatePassed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
2018-03-01SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2018-03-01SenateAmendments by Senator Vogel agreed to
2018-03-01SenateReading of amendments waived
2018-03-01SenateRead third time
2018-02-28SenatePassed by for the day
2018-02-27SenatePassed by for the day
2018-02-26SenatePassed by for the day
2018-02-23SenatePassed by for the day
2018-02-22SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-20SenateReported from Privileges and Elections (11-Y 3-N)
2018-02-08SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2018-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-07HouseVOTE: (54-Y 43-N)
2018-02-07HouseRead third time and passed House (54-Y 43-N)
2018-02-06HousePrinted as engrossed 18101822D-E
2018-02-06HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB1144E
2018-02-06HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2018-02-06HouseRead second time
2018-02-05HouseRead first time
2018-02-02HouseReported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (16-Y 6-N)
2018-01-24HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N)
2018-01-22HouseAssigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #3
2018-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2018-01-10HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101822D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242418.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB1144
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1144+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1144E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1144ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1144H1+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H1803V0003+HB1144
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H18V0023+HB1144
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0421+HB1144
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S08V0107+HB1144
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0639HB1144+HB1144
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0809HB1144+HB1144
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1287+HB1144
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1291+HB1144

Bill Comments

feedback