VA HB1137 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exemptions.
Title
Virginia Fair Housing Law; removes certain exemptions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in General Laws |
2022-02-10 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 1-N) |
2022-02-10 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 1-N) |
2022-01-31 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2022-01-13 | House | Presented and ordered printed 22104394D |