VA HB1129 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Standards of Quality; Standard 2. Increases the requirement for state-supported instructional positions for students identified as having limited English proficiency from 17 full-time equivalent positions for each 1,000 students to 30 full-time equivalent positions for each 1,000 students.
Title
Standards of Quality; increase positions for students with limited English proficiency.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Keam [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. James Scott [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (3-Y 2-N) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-16 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2010-01-26 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (3-Y 2-N) | |
2010-01-19 | House: Assigned App. sub: Elementary and Secondary | |
2010-01-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-01-13 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102404D |