VA HB1125 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1125
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-22 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-22 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
School boards; parental notification of certain threats, behavior, and unlawful acts; panic alarms. Requires, within four hours of receiving notification of (i) a preliminary determination by the threat assessment team that a student poses a threat of violence or physical harm to self or others; (ii) threatening or aberrant behavior that may represent a threat to the school; or (iii) unlawful acts committed on school property, on a school bus, or at a school-sponsored activity that involve the unlawful use or possession of a weapon, homicide, criminal sexual assault, or trespassing, each division superintendent to notify the parent of each student enrolled in the relevant school of such threat, threatening or aberrant behavior, or unlawful act. The bill requires each school board to equip each public elementary and secondary school building in the local school division with at least one panic alarm that adheres to nationally recognized industry standards, including the standards of the National Fire Protection Association and Underwriters Laboratories, and is installed by a licensed and qualified professional. The bill defines "panic alarm" as a silent security system by which the user manually activates a device that sends a non-audible signal to the local law-enforcement agency that indicates a school security emergency, including a non-fire evacuation, lockdown, or active shooter situation, that requires immediate response and assistance from such agency.
Title
School boards; parental notification of certain incidents, Alyssa's law-silent panic alarms.
Sponsors
Del. Timothy Anderson [R] | Del. Amanda Batten [R] | Del. Ronnie Campbell [R] | Del. Phillip Scott [R] |
Del. Kim Taylor [R] | Del. Wren Williams [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-07 - House - House: Continued to 2023 in Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2023 (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2023 (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-22 | House | Left in Education |
2022-02-07 | House | Continued to 2023 in Education (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2023 (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-28 | House | Assigned Education sub: Early Childhood/Innovation |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2022-01-12 | House | Presented and ordered printed 22103629D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1125 (Carry Over) 2022-02-07 - Continued to 2023 in Education (22-Y 0-N)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 1 | 79.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 79.4:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |