VA HB1125 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - VOTE: DEFEATED (33-Y 61-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - VOTE: DEFEATED (33-Y 61-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Charitable Gaming Board; Texas Hold'em poker events. Allows certain qualified organization to conduct Texas Hold'em poker events in conjunction with its charitable gaming activities. The conditions under which a qualified organization may manage, operate, or contract with operators of or conduct Texas Hold'em poker games and tournaments shall be prescribed by the Charitable Gaming Board. In addition, the bill establishes the Problem Gambling Treatment and Support Fund administered by the Commissioner of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services to provide counseling and other support services for compulsive and problem gamblers, develop problem gambling treatment and prevention programs, and provide grants to supporting organizations that provide assistance to compulsive gamblers.
Title
Charitable Gaming Board; Texas Hold'em poker events.
Sponsors
Del. Glenn Davis [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (0-Y 0-N) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 99 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: DEFEATED (33-Y 61-N) (Y: 33 N: 61 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: DEFEATED (33-Y 61-N) (Y: 33 N: 61 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | House | VOTE: DEFEATED (33-Y 61-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Read third time and defeated by House (33-Y 61-N) |
2020-02-07 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1125H1 |
2020-02-07 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20107532D-H1 |
2020-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-05 | House | Committee substitute printed 20107532D-H1 |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (18-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-24 | House | Assigned App. sub: Commerce Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2020-01-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-23 | House | Reported from General Laws (21-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-17 | House | Assigned GL sub: ABC/Gaming |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20105018D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 334.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 340.16 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 340.19 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 340.22 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 340.28:2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 314.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |