VA HB1125 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-18 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-18 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Number of judges; general district court; 25th Judicial District. Adds a fourth judge to the maximum number allowed in the 25th Judicial District, general district court (Alleghany, Augusta, Bath, Botetourt, Buena Vista, Covington, Craig, Highland, Lexington, Rockbridge, Staunton, and Waynesboro). This is a recommendation of the Committee on District Courts.
Title
Number of judges; general district court; 25th Judicial District.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-18 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2016-02-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-01-28 | House | Assigned App. sub: General Government & Capital Outlay |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-01-27 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-20 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2016-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102150D |