VA HB1125 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Administrative impoundment of motor vehicles. Provides for the administrative impoundment of motor vehicles when charged with driving without an operator's license for a second or subsequent time.
Title
Motor vehicles; administrative impoundment thereof when driving without an operator's license.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Keam [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-16 | House: Left in Courts of Justice | |
2010-02-08 | House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely by voice vote | |
2010-01-27 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal | |
2010-01-21 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-01-21 | House: Referred from Transportation by voice vote | |
2010-01-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2010-01-13 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102954D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+sum+HB1125 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+HB1125+hil |