VA HB1125 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0734)
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0734)
Summary
Virginia Port Authority; Craney Island Marine Terminal expansion. Authorizes the Virginia Marine Resources Commission to grant easements and rights-of-way across and in the beds of Hampton Roads Harbor (Lower James River), including a portion of the Baylor Survey, to the Virginia Port Authority, for the eastward expansion of Craney Island.
Title
Port Authority; Marine Resources Commission to grant easements and rights-of-way.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0734) | |
2008-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 734 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-09 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-06 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-06 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1125ER) | |
2008-03-06 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-11 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-11 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-11 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-11 | House: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House | |
2008-02-11 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-11 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-08 | House: Printed as engrossed 081160828-E | |
2008-02-08 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB1125E | |
2008-02-08 | House: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2008-02-08 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-06 | House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-25 | House: Assigned ACNRsub: #3 Chesapeake | |
2008-01-09 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2008-01-09 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 081160828 |
Subjects
Authorities
Commissions, Boards and Institutions Generally
Conservation
Fisheries and Habitat of Tidal Waters
Hampton Roads Area
Waters of the State, Ports, and Harbors
Commissions, Boards and Institutions Generally
Conservation
Fisheries and Habitat of Tidal Waters
Hampton Roads Area
Waters of the State, Ports, and Harbors
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB1125 |