VA HB1123 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Customer access to restrooms. Requires a retail establishment that has a toilet facility for its employees to allow a customer who suffers from Crohn's disease, ulcerative colitis, or other medical condition that requires immediate access to a toilet facility to use that facility during normal business hours if certain conditions are met. A customer who suffers loss as a result of a violation may bring an action to recover damages not to exceed $100.
Title
Restrooms; retail establishment with toilet facility to allow customer access.
Sponsors
Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Sen. John Bell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2016-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-01-21 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2016-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2016-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16103064D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB1123 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB1123+hil |