VA HB1121 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-01 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-01 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Absentee voting; signature requirement; verification of signatures by officers of elections. Requires the officers of elections to compare the signature on an absentee ballot envelope with the signature on that voter's voter registration application. Three officers, including one representative of each political party, are required to agree that the signatures match in order for the absentee ballot to be accepted. If less than three agree, the ballot is given provisional status and the electoral board makes the final determination of its validity. Notice by certified mail is required to be given to the voter. The bill also requires absentee ballot applications to be signed by the applicant's own handwriting or by electronic means, if such electronic signature is created by using a cursor, stylus, or similar device moved by the applicant to capture his signature. Any application signed by any other means shall be rejected.
Title
Absentee voting; verification of signatures by officers of elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-01 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2016-02-12 | House | Continued to 2017 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote |
2016-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 2-N) |
2016-01-19 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Elections |
2016-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2016-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16103099D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 653.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 706 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 709.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 710 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 711 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |