VA HB1121 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 33-12-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0331)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 33-12-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0331)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Veterans Services; personnel. Provides that a ratio of claims agents with the Department of Veterans Services to the number of veterans in the Commonwealth shall be one agent for every 23,000 veterans. Current law requires sufficient staff to maintain a ratio of one claims agent for every 26,212 veterans.
Title
Veterans Services, Department of; ratio of claims agents to number of veterans in State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-22 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0331) | |
2012-03-22 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 331 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-07 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-07 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1121ER) | |
2012-03-07 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-29 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-14 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-14 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-02-12 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-10 | House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-09 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-26 | House: Assigned App. sub: Public Safety | |
2012-01-24 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-01-24 | House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-19 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-17 | House: Assigned GL sub: #3 ABC/Gaming | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2012-01-11 | House: Presented and ordered printed 12103219D |
Same As/Similar To
SB254 (Same As) 2012-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0342)