VA HB1116 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0149)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0149)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Scenic River designation. Extends the State Scenic River designation of the Banister River from the current 38.4 miles to 63.3 miles.
Title
Banister River; Scenic River designation.
Sponsors
Del. James Edmunds [R] | Del. Les Adams [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 17-N) (Y: 81 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 17-N) (Y: 81 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0149) | |
2014-03-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 149 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1116ER) |
2014-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-01-28 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 17-N) |
2014-01-28 | House | Read third time and passed House (80-Y 17-N) |
2014-01-27 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-01-24 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-22 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (19-Y 3-N) |
2014-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2014-01-13 | House | Presented and ordered printed 14103802D |
Subjects
Conservation
Counties, Cities, and Towns
Halifax County
Highways, Bridges, and Ferries
Pittsylvania County
Waters of the State, Ports, and Harbors
Counties, Cities, and Towns
Halifax County
Highways, Bridges, and Ferries
Pittsylvania County
Waters of the State, Ports, and Harbors