VA HB1114 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0109)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0109)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Penalties for failure to appear; exclusion. Excludes any person who is (i) incarcerated in any correctional facility or (ii) (a) detained in any state or federal facility or (b) in the custody of a law-enforcement officer at the time such person is required to appear before any court or judicial officer from the penalty for willful failure to appear before any such court or judicial officer as required after such person has been charged with any offense or convicted of any offense and execution of sentence is suspended. Penalties for failure to appear; exclusion. Excludes any person who is (i) incarcerated in any correctional facility or (ii) (a) detained in any state or federal facility or (b) in the custody of a law-enforcement officer at the time such person is required to appear before any court or judicial officer from the penalty for willful failure to appear before any such court or judicial officer as required after such person has been charged with any offense or convicted of any offense and execution of sentence is suspended.
Title
Failure to appear; contempt of court, penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (54-Y 42-N) (Y: 54 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (51-Y 46-N) (Y: 51 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (51-Y 46-N) (Y: 51 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0109) | |
2024-03-20 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 109 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-28 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-28 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1114ER) |
2024-02-28 | House | Enrolled |
2024-02-23 | House | VOTE: Adoption (54-Y 42-N) |
2024-02-23 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 24107874D-S1 (54-Y 42-N) |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1114S1 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 24107874D-S1 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24107874D-S1 |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-08 | House | VOTE: Passage (51-Y 46-N) |
2024-02-08 | House | Read third time and passed House (51-Y 46-N) |
2024-02-07 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1114H1 |
2024-02-07 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24106788D-H1 |
2024-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-02 | House | Committee substitute printed 24106788D-H1 |
2024-02-02 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 9-N) |
2024-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) |
2024-01-30 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2024-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24104876D |
Same As/Similar To
SB643 (Similar To) 2024-02-13 - Chair votes No
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 69.24 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 456 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 128 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |